This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/26/2023 at 05:10:20 (UTC).

Kovacs v. Mek Norwood Pines, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 Kovacs filed an Other lawsuit against Mek Norwood Pines, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McFetridge, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6960

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McFetridge, James

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Andre Kovacs

Appellant and Defendant

Mek Norwood Pines, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Dawn Marie Smith

Attorney at Smith Clinesmith LLP

325 N. Saint Paul Street, 29Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Lann G. McIntyre

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Kathleen Marie Walker

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

701 B Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 03/13/2023 By 31 Day(s) Appellant's Appendix and Opening Brief Due: 03/13/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 02/10/2023 By 30 Day(s) Appellant's Appendix and Opening Brief Due: 02/10/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/2/22, designating an appendix only. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 1/11/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appeal not selected for mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: HOCH, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondent's Mediation Statement Due: 10/14/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: By appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after the appellant files.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: And Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due 10/04/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid. R325709.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court 09/09/22. Order denying Petition to Compel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34202100312696CUPOGDS; Trial Court Judge: McFetridge, James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less