This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/08/2023 at 06:14:00 (UTC).

KOSHIN v. S.C. (ZARATE)

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 KOSHIN filed an Other lawsuit against C ZARATE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7061

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Koshin LTD.

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Juan Zarate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jeffrey A. Swedo

Charles V. Berwanger

Andrea Kaye Williams

Probal Gerard Young

Don Willenburg

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorney

Robert J. Mandell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2023

DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned (unable to forward)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including January 25, 2023, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2022

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2022

DocketDescription: Record requested

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Koshin LTD. Attorney: Don Willenburg

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B320165; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV41198

[+] Read More [-] Read Less