This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/15/2023 at 22:01:13 (UTC).

Korman et al. v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Korman filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Massullo, Anne-Christine and Haines, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7260

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Massullo, Anne-Christine

Haines, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Robert Korman

Nancy Ryti

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

Charles Adam Nunziato

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Bryan A. Kurtz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate/prohibition and accompanying stay request are denied. * Before Simons, Acting P.J. and Langhorne, J. (Judge of the Napa County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Copy of order denying petition sent to both petitioners via U.S. Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate/prohibition and accompanying stay request are denied. * Before Simons, Acting P.J. and Langhorne, J. (Judge of the Napa County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid by credit card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits 1 - 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief Stay Requested of April 12, 2023 Case Management Conference with Honorable Anne-Christine Massullo and any further matters until writ is determined.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC22601126; Trial Court Judge: Massullo, Anne-Christine; Trial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC22601126; Trial Court Judge: Haines, Charles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less