This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/23/2021 at 16:18:57 (UTC).

Knapp v. Ginsberg et al.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Knapp filed an Other lawsuit against Ginsberg. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lui, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7559

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lui, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Brooke Knapp

Respondents and Defendants

Lawerence A. Ginsberg

Harris-Ginsberg LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Adam Pines

Attorney at Glaser, Weil, Fink, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd. 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Kay Saunders

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

555 S. Flower Street 45Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Arezoo Jamshidi

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

402 W. Broadway Suite 1850

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 05/05/2021 By 30 Day(s) ext arb 30 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Lawerence A. Ginsberg Attorney: Arezoo Jamshidi Defendant and Respondent: Harris-Ginsberg LLP Attorney: Arezoo Jamshidi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 05/05/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brooke KnappAttorney: Adam Pines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Lawerence A. GinsbergAttorney: Arezoo Jamshidi Defendant and Respondent: Harris-Ginsberg LLPAttorney: Arezoo Jamshidi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: ext rb to 3/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: ext rb to 3/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: ext rb to 2/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Respondent opposition to motion for judicial notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Three Volumes of Appendices.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brooke KnappAttorney: Adam Pines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Arezoo Jamshidi associating in as counsel for respondents Larry A. Ginsberg et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: appellant's notice filed 9/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brooke Knapp Attorney: Adam Pines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brooke KnappAttorney: Adam Pines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card by Allen Gilbert Brooke Knapp, Plaintiff and Appellant Adam Pines, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 8, 2020 by Brook Knapp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV11400; Trial Court Judge: Lui, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris-Ginsberg LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PINES ADAM