This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/18/2022 at 15:00:23 (UTC).

KLINE v. ZIMMER

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 KLINE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against ZIMMER. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5373

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Gary Kline

Appellant and Defendant

Zimmer, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Consumer Attorneys of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary M. Paul

Attorney at Waters Kraus & Paul LLP

222 N. Sepulveda Boulevard, Suite 1900

El Segundo, CA 90245

Michael B. Gurien

Attorney at Waters Kraus & Paul, LLP.

222 N Pacific Coast Highwy, Suite, 1900

El Segundo, CA 90245-5608

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Tarifa B. Laddon

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Amanda Semaan

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6543

Joseph M. Price

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center 90 S. 7Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Bruce Jones

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Brian P. Barrow

Attorney at Bartlett Barrow LLP

225 South Lake Avenue, Suite 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one box

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The requests for an order directing depublication of the opinion are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Gary Kline Attorney: Michael B. Gurien Reply to answer to petition filed. Due on 08/19/2022 By 0 Day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of respondent and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the reply to answer to petition for review is extended to and including August 19, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: respondent requesting extension until August 19 2022 to file reply to answer to petition for review. by Michael B. Gurien, counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Zimmer, Inc. Attorney: Tarifa B. Laddon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: Zimmer, Inc., Defendant and Appellant Bruce Jones, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of appellant and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the answer to petition for review is extended to and including August 8, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (another request pending); Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Gary Kline Attorney: Michael B. Gurien

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Consumer Attorneys of California Attorney: Brian P. Barrow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: By Bruce Jones, counsel for appellant, seeking a 14-day extension to August 8, 2022, to file the answer to petition for review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One box.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Gary Kline Attorney: Michael B. Gurien

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302544; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC444834

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Consumer Attorneys of California is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmer Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Patrick Barrow