This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2022 at 03:15:40 (UTC).

KLA BPL Portfolio Owner LLC v. NF Plant Enterprises, LP

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 KLA BPL Portfolio Owner LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NF Plant Enterprises, LP. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Watkins, Shirley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9683

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Watkins, Shirley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

KLA BPL Portfolio Owner LLC

Appellants, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Ross Dress For Less, Inc.

NF Plant Enterprises, LP

Ross Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Ryan Thomas Waggoner

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

865 S. Figueroa St., Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Appellant, Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Harry W. R. Chamberlain, II

Attorney at Buchalter

1000 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Brandon Matthew Carr

Attorney at Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

55 2Nd St Ste 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105-3493

Glenn Philip Zwang

Attorney at Buchalter Nemer

55 Second Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Edward E. Weiman

11400 West Olympic Blvd. 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1582

Marc E. Rohatiner

11400 West Olympic Blvd. Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Joel N. Klevens

Attorney at Glazer, Weil, Fink, Jacobs & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard, 19Th Floo

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Patricia L. Glaser

Attorney at Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd. 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final; Author: Stratton, Maria E.; Participants: Harutunian III, Albert T. Grimes, Elizabeth A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: NF Plant Enterprises, LP Attorney: Joel N. Klevens Attorney: Patricia L. Glaser Appellant's Reply brief was due 11/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Stores, Inc. Attorney: Brandon Matthew Carr Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang Attorney: Harry W. R. Chamberlain, II Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc. Attorney: Brandon Matthew Carr Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang Attorney: Harry W. R. Chamberlain, II Appellant's reply brief was due on 11/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: NF Plant Enterprises, LPAttorney: Joel N. Klevens Attorney: Patricia L. Glaser; Notes: Appellant's Reply brief was due 11/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Stores, Inc.Attorney: Brandon Matthew Carr Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang Attorney: Harry W. R. Chamberlain, II Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.Attorney: Brandon Matthew Carr Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang Attorney: Harry W. R. Chamberlain, II; Notes: Appellant's reply brief was due on 11/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: NF Plant Enterprises, LPAttorney: Joel N. Klevens Attorney: Patricia L. Glaser; Notes: [Appeal Dec 17, 2020 (R)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Stores, Inc. Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc. Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang re Notice of appeal filed December 3, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Stores, Inc.Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.Attorney: Glenn Philip Zwang; Notes: re Notice of appeal filed December 3, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: [Appeal Dec 17, 2020 (R)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Dec 17, 2020 by NF Plant Enterprises, LP (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 civil filing fee paid by check #388520[Appeal Dec 3, 2020]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: [Appeal Dec 3, 2020]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Dec 3, 2020 by Ross Stores, Inc. et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20VECV00733; Trial Court Judge: Watkins, Shirley

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NF PLANT ENTERPRISES LP is a litigant

Latest cases where ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ross Stores, Inc. is a litigant