This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/22/2021 at 09:19:20 (UTC).

K.J. v. Superior Court for the County of Solano

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 K J filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Solano. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniels, D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1206

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Daniels, D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

K. J.

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Solano

Interested Parties

Solano County Health & Social Services Department

C. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Tracy Marie De Soto

Attorney at Windansea Law Offices

7584 Trade Street

San Diego, CA 92121

Caroline Rosen DeBois

Po Box 1634

Benicia, CA 94510-4634

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of Solano County Counsel

675 Texas Street - Suite 6600

Fairfield, CA 94533

Kristen Annette Pofahl

Attorney at Dependency Legal Services

1234 Empire St Ste 1200

Fairfield, CA 94533-5711

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Shipped to state retention center, box # / list #:; Notes: ***Note: Entire file electronic***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: The filing of the record in this matter is stricken for failure to timely file a petition for extraordinary writ within the time allowed by California Rules of Court, rule 8.452(c)(1). The failure to file a timely petition shall preclude any subsequent appellate review of the order setting a hearing under Welfare and Institutions Code section 366.26 (Welf. & Inst. Code, section 366.26, subd. (l)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Notes: BY THE COURT: The filing of the record in this matter is stricken for failure to timely file a petition for extraordinary writ within the time allowed by California Rules of Court, rule 8.452(c)(1). The failure to file a timely petition shall preclude any subsequent appellate review of the order setting a hearing under Welfare and Institutions Code section 366.26 (Welf. & Inst. Code, section 366.26, subd. (l)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Notes: Petitioner: K. J. Attorney: Tracy Marie De Soto Letter dated 11/9/2020 by attorney Tracy De Soto for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketBrief: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Party Attorney: Petitioner: K. J.Attorney: Tracy Marie De Soto; Notes: Letter dated 11/9/2020 by attorney Tracy De Soto for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Tracy De Soto is associated as co-consel for K.J. (Mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: Reporter's Transcript - 4 volumesClerk's Transcript filed (see entry #70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: W & I 366.26 Hearing is February 9, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Caroline DeBois, attorney for K. J., mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: J44356; Trial Court Judge: Daniels, D.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Solano is a litigant

Latest cases where Solano County Health and Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Annette Pofahl