Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/14/2021 at 13:49:41 (UTC).

Kihagi v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Kihagi filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Puri, Vedica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2090

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    First Appellate District - Division 1

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Puri, Vedica

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anne Kihagi

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Nozari 2, LLC

Xelan Prop 1, LLC

Zoriall, LLC

City and County of San Francisco

Julia Mwangi

Renka Prop, LLC

Kevin Singer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Peter J. Keith

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1390 Market Street, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Michael S. Weiss

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1390 Market Street, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Paul E. Manasian

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul Manasian

1310 65Th Street

Emeryville, CA 94608

Karen Y. Uchiyama

Attorney at Law Offices of Karen Y. Uchiyama

733 Webster Street

San Francisco, CA 94117

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and/or supersedeas and request for stay are denied. Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Banke, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and/or supersedeas and request for stay are denied. Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Banke, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 4 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 3 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Writ of Supersedeas or Other Appropriate Relief From Order of the San Francisco County Superior Court Denying Defendant's Motion to Change Venue on February 24, 2021. Request for Urgent and Immediate Stay Pending Resolution and Finalization of Writ and Relief Requested Herein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC15546152; Trial Court Judge: Puri, Vedica

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZORIALL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Xelan Prop 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NOZARI 2 LLC is a litigant