This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/11/2023 at 16:01:38 (UTC).

Kielar v. The Superior Court of Placer County

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Kielar filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Placer County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6773

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jones, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mark Kielar

Respondent

The Superior Court of Placer County

Interested Party

Hyundai Motor America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer Bennett

Roger Kirnos

Interested Party Attorneys

Brian Takahashi

Michael C. Foley

Jason R. Litt

John A. Taylor Jr.

Eric S. Boorstin

 

Court Documents

C096773

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition granted by opinion; Disposition Type: Final Let a peremptory writ of mandate issue directing respondent superior court to vacate its June 16, 2022 order granting Hyundai Motor America's motion to compel arbitration and stay the action, and enter a new order denying the motion. Mark Kielar shall recover his costs in this original proceeding. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.493(a)(1)(A).); Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Renner, Jonathan K.; Participants: Hull, Jr., Harry E. (Concur) Earl, Laurie M. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published) Let a peremptory writ of mandate issue directing respondent superior court to vacate its June 16, 2022 order granting Hyundai Motor America's motion to compel arbitration and stay the action, and enter a new order denying the motion. Mark Kielar shall recover his costs in this original proceeding. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.493(a)(1)(A).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed additional cites.; Notes: By real party in interest. Filed with permission.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Jennifer Bennett argued on behalf of the Petnr. John A. Taylor, Jr., argued on behalf of the RPI.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed additional cites.; Notes: By petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed additional cites.; Notes: By real party in interest.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Argument continued to:; Notes: Tuesday, June 27, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. Renner, Acting P.J.; Earl, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral argument - to court.; Notes: By petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Argument order sent.; Notes: This case is ordered on calendar for hearing on Friday, May 19, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. Robie, Acting P.J. Tentative panel: Hull, Renner, Earl (subject to change without notice).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed additional cites.; Notes: By petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice application; Notes: for Linnet Davis-Stermitz to appear as counsel on behalf of petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order to show cause with service filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Real party in interest granted to 11/17/22 to file written return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Real party in interest requesting to 11/17/22 to file written return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: RPI, adding law firm Horvitz & Levy LLP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioner's counsel enclosing order to show cause and directing to serve in same manner as summons and return original to this court with proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order granting order to show cause.; Notes: Written return by real party in interest is to be served and filed on or before October 3, 2022. Petitioner's reply, if any, is to be served and filed with this court within 15 days after the filing of the written return. HULL, Acting P.J.; RENNER, J.; EARL, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition. 3 Vols. (717 pp.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate w/CIEP. No interested parties listed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less