This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/24/2023 at 21:28:09 (UTC).

Khan v. David

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Khan filed an Other lawsuit against David. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8727

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Mahim Khan

Appellant and Defendant

Alkiviades David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gloria R. Allred

Dolores Leal

Norman Pine

Nathan Goldberg

Renee Mochkatel

Scott L. Tillett

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Fred D Heather

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Mahim Khan is entitled to recover her costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record returned from Supreme Court.; Notes: 2x6"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S275391]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including October 4, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied. [S275391]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S275391

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court.; Notes: 2x6"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for rehearing denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: appellant's petition for rehearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final 27p./AFF/LCH; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Lui, Elwood; Participants: Hoffstadt, Brian M. (Concur) Chavez, Victoria M. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant Alkiviades David*B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: *B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed April 27, 2020, is dismissed.*B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: Non-compliance from lasc filed Aug 11, 2020*B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC654017; Trial Court Judge: Court, Michelle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alkiviades David Attorney: Amir Kaltgrad Attorney: Fred D Heather *B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Alkiviades DavidAttorney: Amir Kaltgrad Attorney: Fred D Heather; Notes: *B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed on May 07, 2020*B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #380599 of $775.00 for Notice of Appeal filed on April 27, 2020*B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on April 27, 2020 by Alkiviades David*B305849*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less