This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/07/2021 at 18:06:10 (UTC).

Kent Lamb, as Trustee of the Mardon C Lamb and Geraldine W Lamb 1992 Trust v. Herron

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Kent Lamb, as Trustee of the Mardon C Lamb and Geraldine W Lamb 1992 Trust filed an Other lawsuit against Herron. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cotton, Jr., Huey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1741

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cotton, Jr., Huey

 

Party Details

Appellant

Kent Lamb, as Trustee of the Mardon C Lamb and Geraldine W Lamb 1992 Trust

Respondent

Carolyn Herron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Brian David Walters

Attorney at Poole Shaffery & Koegle, LLP

25350 Magic Mountain Pkwy, 2Nd Floor

Valencia, CA 91355

Respondent Attorneys

Michael W. Feenberg

Attorney at NEMECEK & COLE

16255 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436-5399

Vikram Sohal

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436-2300

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Filed: April 20, 2021 - Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated April 21, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Kent Lamb, as Trustee of the Mardon C Lamb and Geraldine W Lamb 1992 Trust Attorney: Brian David Walters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Kent Lamb, as Trustee of the Mardon C Lamb and Geraldine W Lamb 1992 TrustAttorney: Brian David Walters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check#1033719 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: April 16, 2021, minute order that the Notice of Appeal filed March 29, 2021 corrected nunc pro tunc and deems the Notice of Appeal filed March 19, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 3/19/2021 by Kent Lamb, as Trustee of the Mardon C Lamb and Geraldine W Lamb 1992 Trust*The NOA filed 3/29/2021 deemed filed as 3/19/2021 - See LASC minute order dated 4/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19VECV00774; Trial Court Judge: Cotton, Jr., Huey

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALTERS BRIAN D.