This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/13/2021 at 13:40:34 (UTC).

KAUFMAN v. PROSPECT FUNDING

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 KAUFMAN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against PROSPECT FUNDING. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4881

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

Panish, Shea & Boyle, LLP

Peter L. Kaufman

Respondent and Defendant

Prospect Funding LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

Douglas Adam Linde

Erica Allen Gonzales

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Tyson W. Kovash

Patrick Ronald Mahoney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned and re-sent; Notes: The Linde Law Firm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including January 5, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Prospect Funding LLC Attorney: Patrick Ronald Mahoney Attorney: Tyson W. Kovash

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B293259; Disposition: Reversed in Full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BS169525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less