This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/11/2023 at 12:12:34 (UTC).

Kaplan v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Kaplan filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Landin, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7724

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Landin, Dennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Elizabeth Kaplan

Respondents

Hon. Dennis J. Landin

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

DOE Defendants 1 through 10

Burton A. Mitchell

Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP.

Aaron Kaplan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Lee Cohen

Sharon J. Arkin

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Bert H. Deixler

Nary Kim

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of prohibition filed September 28, 2020, the preliminary opposition filed October 1, 2020, and the reply filed October 12, 2020. The petition is denied. Petitioner fails to demonstrate the respondent court erred in concluding the arbitrator must decide the issue of arbitrability.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Response to preliminary opposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee by Real Parties in InterestResponsive filing fee paid by Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Real Parties in interest re the preliminary opposition filed on October 1, 2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Real parties in interest's preliminary opposition to petition for peremptory writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Petitioner's certificate of interested parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 2 of 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less