This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/11/2023 at 07:05:20 (UTC).

Kaplan v. Gimelstob

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Kaplan filed an Other lawsuit against Gimelstob. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brazile, Kevin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5197

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brazile, Kevin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Madison Kaplan

Appellant and Defendant

Justin Gimelstob

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew G. Kleiner

Norvik Azarian

Asim Kishore Desai

Scott W. McCaskill

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Deborah Anne Hedley

Robert M. Dato

 

Court Documents

B315197

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: The parties are to bear their own costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full with directions; Disposition Type: Final 17p./AFD/HCB; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Hoffstadt, Brian M.; Participants: Benke, Patricia D. (Concur) Chavez, Victoria M. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) 17p./AFD/HCBThe order denying Gimelstob's anti-SLAPP motion is affirmed with directions for the trial court to strike those allegations in paragraphs 17 and 32 of Kaplan's cross-complaint regarding Gimelstob's accusation that Kaplan disparaged his father. The parties are to bear their own costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: 9:34:05 - 9:47:25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: all counsel re: in-person oral argument

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Scott McCaskill, respondent's counsel - argue (15 minutes)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Robert M. Dato, counsel for appellant- argue, 15 minutes;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: Thursday, November 17, 2022 at 9:00am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Robert M. Dato, appellant's counsel - will request oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: service of notice of appeal on Judicial Council per CCP 425.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: notice to appellant's counsel: Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16(j)(1) and California Rule of Court 8.29(a), a copy of your notice of appeal must be transmitted to the Judicial Council at 455 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102-3660.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-4 (1138 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 20, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Justin Gimelstob Attorney: Eric Robert McDonough

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Justin GimelstobAttorney: Eric Robert McDonough

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing Fee $775.00 Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sept. 10, 2021: Justin Gimelstob

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV19647; Trial Court Judge: Brazile, Kevin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less