This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2023 at 00:07:57 (UTC).

Kanner v. Karl De Costa et al.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Kanner filed an Other lawsuit against Karl De Costa. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1139

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Jana Kanner

Respondents and Defendants

Karl De Costa

Mitchell L. Cohen

Martin Godin

Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Robert Steven Ross

Attorney at Ross Law Inc.

15332 Antioch St., No. 148

Los Angeles, CA 90272

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Joseph J. Ybarra

Attorney at Halpern May Ybarra Gelberg LLP

550 South Hope Street Suite 2330

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mitchell Fremont Mulbarger

Attorney at Baker, Keener & Nahra

633 W. Fifth Street, Suite 5500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael McCarthy

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jana Kanner Attorney: Robert Steven Ross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jana KannerAttorney: Robert Steven Ross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: AOB was due 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jana Kanner Attorney: Robert Steven Ross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on July 11, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).). The order submitted with the civil case information statement is a tentative ruling and not a conformed copy of an appealable order/judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jana KannerAttorney: Robert Steven Ross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on May 2, 2022 by Jana Kanner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV28669; Trial Court Judge: Fujie, Holly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITCHEL SILBERBERG & KNUPP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YBARRA JOSEPH JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULBARGER MITCHELL F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCARTHY MICHAEL