This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/29/2021 at 02:34:30 (UTC).

Kamin v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Kamin filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0350

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lee, Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Monica Kamin

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon Richard Lee Dept C-31 700 Civic Center West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

TO8

Brett Holt

Alex Handley Phelan

Ryan Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Russell Mackay Frandsen

680 E. Colorado Blvd Suite 180

Pasadena, CA 91101

Interested Party Attorney

Kenneth Blair Stratton

Attorney at Rogoway Law Group

115 4Th Street Ste B

Santa Rosa, CA 95401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is DENIED. MOORE, ACTING P. J. * Before Moore, Acting P. J., Fybel, J., and Ikola, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.; Notes: By Monica Kamin Exhibits are included within the petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel re: petition and all the defects that need to be corrected.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: By Monica KaminExhibits are included within the petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRATTON KENNETH