This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/30/2021 at 17:57:56 (UTC).

Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cunningham III, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3117

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cunningham III, David

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.

Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc.

Parex Usa, Inc.

Union Carbide Corporation

Mission Stucco Co.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. David S. Cunningham III

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Jose J. Perez

Rachel J. Perez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Elizabeth Jane Carpenter

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, LLP

300 S Grand Ave Ste 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3138

Melanie Leigh Ameele

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

300 S Grand Ave Ste 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Margaret I. Johnson

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield

300 South Grand Ave. - #2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Vanthara Meak

Attorney at Howard Rome Martin & Ridley, LLP

1900 O'Farrell Street Suite 28

San Mateo, CA 94403

Rhonda Liza Woo

Attorney at Howard Rome Martin & Ridley LLP

1900 Ofarrell St Ste 280

San Mateo, CA 94403

J. Alan Warfield

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Craig Robert Maki

Attorney at Selman Breitman, LLP

11766 Wilshire Blvd., 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6538

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Melissa P. Wilner

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd LLC

6101 S Centinela Avenue Suite 340

Los Angeles, CA 90066

David L. Amell

Attorney at Maune, Raichle, Hartley, French & Mudd

6101 W. Centinela Avenue Suite 340

Culver City, CA 90230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed June 17, 2021. The petition is denied. Petitioners have an adequate remedy by way of appeal after judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The immediate stay request is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: EXHIBITS VOL. 1-3 OUT OF 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: IMMEDIATE STAY REQUESTED; Petition for Writ of Mandate, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MISSION STUCCO CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant