This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/12/2023 at 07:13:51 (UTC).

Kahangi v. Finex Real Estate Investment, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 Kahangi filed an Other lawsuit against Finex Real Estate Investment, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6423

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Saiid Kahangi

Respondents and Defendants

Finex Real Estate Investment, Inc.

Jamal Saberi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan W. Black

Attorney at Weston Law Group, PC

1600 South Main Street, Suite 260

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Stephanie Colette Meyer

Attorney at Weston Law Group PC

145 E. Prospaect Ave. Suite 202

Danville, CA 94526

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Alan H. Packer

Attorney at Newmeyer & Dillon, LLP

2033 N. Main Street, Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Brandon Alexander Clouse

Attorney at Newmeyer & Dillion

1333 N California Blvd Ste 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/03/2022. Designating CT without RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: for Respondents FinEx Real Estate Investment, Inc. and Jamal Saberi; no interested;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by Weston Law Group (check 2288)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal (no superior court stamp)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Saiid Kahangi Attorney: Jonathan W. Black (judgment attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: By appellant Kahangi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Saiid KahangiAttorney: Jonathan W. Black; Notes: (judgment attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 09/21/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Saiid Kahangi appealing judgment from 07/25/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1501706

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINEX REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon A Clouse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Packer, Alan H