Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/21/2021 at 01:20:21 (UTC).

Khabushani v. Ehteram et al.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Khabushani filed an Other lawsuit against Ehteram. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bennett, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0079

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 6

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bennett, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Michael Khabushani

Weslake Village, CA 91362

Defendants and Respondents

Ramin Zarrin Ehteram

Najila Kordrostam Brent

Leticia Gonzales

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Najila K. Brent

Attorney at Law Offices Of Najila K. Brent

3424 Carson Street Suite 500

Torrance, CA 90503

Dennis N. Jones

Attorney at Myers, Widders, Gibson, Jones & Feingold, LLP

5425 Everglades Street

Ventura, CA 93003

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: CT's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 2-18-21 from VCSC; Notice of Rescinding Default - designation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: CT's only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Michael Khabushani Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; missing order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Michael KhabushaniPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: dtd 2-8-21 from VCSC; to be cured within 15 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Request for fee waiver by aplt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MICHAEL KHABUSHANI'S APPLICATION FOR FEE WAIVER ORDER AND REQUEST FOR REVOCATION OF FEE WAIVER ORDER PRIVILAGE DUE TO HIS FEE WAIVER FRAUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 1-26-21 from VCSC; Order granting Court Fee Waiver - appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 1-26-21 by aplt. M. Khabushani from 1-21-21 order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2016-00480666-CU-CO-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Bennett, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENT NAJILA K. LAW OFFICES OF

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES DENNIS NEIL