This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/28/2022 at 02:50:28 (UTC).

K. Hovnanian at Meridian Hills, LLC v. Ventura County Superior Court

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 K Hovnanian at Meridian Hills, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Ventura County Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Borrell, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5471

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Borrell, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

K. Hovnanian at Meridian Hills, LLC

Respondent

Ventura County Superior Court

Hon. Mark S. Borrell 800 S. Victoria Ave

Ventura, CA 93009

Interested Party

Manuel Madrid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

James Lawrence Bothwell

Attorney at Huguenin Kahn LLP

3001 Lava Ridge Court Ste 300

Roseville, CA 95661-4271

Edward Russell Huguenin

Attorney at Huguenin Kahn LLP

3001 Lava Ridge Court Suite 300

Roseville, CA 95661-7098

Interested Party Attorney

Raymond Ghermezian

Attorney at Raymond Ghermezian, A Prof Law Corp

3435 Wilshire Blvd. Ste 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By petitioner K. Hovnanian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: [SEE ORDER] . . . The petition for a writ of mandate or, alternatively, prohibition and request for an immediate stay are denied. GY J. Tangeman, dissenting.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Petitioner: K. Hovnanian at Meridian Hills, LLC Attorney: James Lawrence Bothwell [INFORMAL REPLY]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner: K. Hovnanian at Meridian Hills, LLCAttorney: James Lawrence Bothwell; Notes: [INFORMAL REPLY]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Manuel Madrid Attorney: Raymond Ghermezian [INFORMAL RESPONSE] with attached exhibit #1 (K. Hovnaian at Meridian Hills, LLC Answer to Complaint dtd 5-16-17) 18 pages / LBF + EXH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Manuel MadridAttorney: Raymond Ghermezian; Notes: [INFORMAL RESPONSE] with attached exhibit #1 (K. Hovnaian at Meridian Hills, LLC Answer to Complaint dtd 5-16-17) 18 pages / LBF + EXH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: [SEE LETTER] . . . This court requests that the real party in interest (plaintiff Manuel Madrid) submit an informal letter brief in response to the writ petition. In addition to the issues raised in the petition, please discuss: (1) whether plaintiff contends that KH committed acts that affirmatively contributed to plaintiff's injuries pursuant to Hooker v. Department of Transportation (2002) 27 Cal.4th 198; (2) which party had the burden of proof on summary judgment to prove or disprove that element; and (3) the state of the evidence showing a triable issue of fact regarding that element. (See, e.g., Gonzalez v. Mathis (2021) 12 Cal.5th 29, 46-47; Khosh v. Staples Construction Co., Inc. (2016) 4 Cal.App.5th 712, 718; Alvarez v. Seaside Transportation Services LLC (2017) 13 Cal.App.5th 635; Tverberg v. Fillner Constr. (2021) 202 Cal.App.4th 1439.) The informal response may be in letter format and should be served and filed on or before November 24, 2021. KH shall serve and file an informal reply in letter format within ten (10) days after the filing of the informal response.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate; STAY REQUESTED Petitioner Requests a Temporary Stay of October 25, 2021 Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2017-00494185-CU-PO-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Borrell, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K. Hovnanian at Meridian Hills, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT/ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ghermezian, Raymond