This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/29/2022 at 04:01:53 (UTC).

J.V. v. J.R.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 J filed an Other lawsuit against v J R. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Behan, Wendy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9917

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Behan, Wendy

 

Party Details

Appellant

J. V.

Respondent

J. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Lillian Michelle Loeffler

4295 Gesner Street

San Diego, CA 92117

Rupa Gupta Singh

Attorney at Niddrie Addams Fuller Singh LLP

600 West Broadway, Ste. 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent Attorney

Carrie Lynn Mitchell

Attorney at McDougal Love Boehmer Foley Lyon & Canlas

8100 La Mesa Boulevard, Suite 200

La Mesa, CA 91942

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Upon written request filed by appellant, the appeal is DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has received appellant's March 17, 2022 letter stating that the parties are attempting to settle the matter and requesting that the court stay the appeal for 45 days. Appellant's request for a stay is denied. On the court's own motion, the deadline for appellant to file an opening brief is extended to April 18, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Appellant's notice of settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: Reporter's Transcripts - 2 (167 pgs.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSRs, Rilling: 10/1/21, Yen: 9/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 12/10/21 amended designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 12/1/21 re POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: 12/1/21 notice of proceedings not reported

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 11/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 11/17/21 by J.V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 21FDV03979E; Trial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 21FL009649E; Trial Court Judge: Behan, Wendy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL CARRIE LYNN