This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/13/2023 at 02:31:15 (UTC).

Judge v. County of Los Angeles

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Judge filed an Other lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Borenstein, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8649

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Borenstein, Mark

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Michael Judge

Appellants and Defendants

County of Los Angeles

Edwin Barragan

Other

Rule 8.29

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Thomas Dunn

Attorney at The Cochran Firm

4929 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1010

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Melinda Lee Cantrall

Attorney at Hurrell Cantrall LLP

725 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Rickey Ivie

Attorney at Ivie, McNeill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2919

Other Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 03/06/2023 By 62 Day(s) Grimes, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice of designating exhibits for transmittalCounty of Los Angeles, Defendant and Appellant Melinda Lee Cantrall, Retained counsel County of Los Angeles, Defendant and Appellant Rickey Ivie, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Requested for 03/06/2023 By 62 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Michael Judge Attorney: Brian Thomas Dunn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 03/06/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: County of Los AngelesAttorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Attorney: Rickey Ivie Defendant and Appellant: Edwin BarraganAttorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Attorney: Rickey Ivie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Michael JudgeAttorney: Brian Thomas Dunn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's appendix filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: RBF was due 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred.; Notes: The ruling on the request for judicial notice is deferred for decision by the panel that will be assigned to decide this appeal after briefing is complete. Any party opposing the request may state its opposition in the opposing brief or in a separate filing. The parties may refer to the material that is the subject of the request for judicial notice in their briefs without prejudice to this court deciding either to grant or deny the request in the course of resolving the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Appellants counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: notice designating record filed 2/23/22;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: County of Los Angeles Attorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Attorney: Rickey Ivie Defendant and Appellant: Edwin Barragan Attorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Attorney: Rickey Ivie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: County of Los AngelesAttorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Attorney: Rickey Ivie Defendant and Appellant: Edwin BarraganAttorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Attorney: Rickey Ivie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Exempt GOV Code 6103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on February 14, 2022 by County of Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV06708; Trial Court Judge: Borenstein, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant