This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/27/2022 at 03:17:10 (UTC).

Juarbe v. Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Juarbe filed an Other lawsuit against Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Landin, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4040

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Landin, Dennis

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Alberto Juarbe

Defendant and Respondent

Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Kurtz

Attorney at Law Offices of Gary Kurtz

30101 Agoura Court Suite 118

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Christopher Brian Queally

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

5 Park Plz Ste 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alberto Juarbe Attorney: Gary Kurtz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alberto JuarbeAttorney: Gary Kurtz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD Attorney: Christopher Brian Queally

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTDAttorney: Christopher Brian Queally

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Stipulation for extension of time for respondent's brief to be filed in 30 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alberto Juarbe Attorney: Gary Kurtz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Opening brief submitted rejected for lack of bookmarks.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (377 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alberto Juarbe Attorney: Gary Kurtz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant ( July 9, 2021 by Alberto Juarbe ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alberto JuarbeAttorney: Gary Kurtz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# 1547 for $775.00 (Law Office of Gary Kurtz, Inc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 9, 2021 by Alberto Juarbe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCP00545; Trial Court Judge: Landin, Dennis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUEALLY CHRISTOPHER BRIAN