This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/03/2023 at 20:22:10 (UTC).

JTL Investor, LLC v. Herscu et al.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 JTL Investor, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Herscu. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fruin, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6507

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fruin, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

JTL Investor, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

Robert Herscu

Peter Lowy

729 Seward, LLC

Cross Defendants

Terry Bird

Chapman, Bird & Tessler, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

David Eric Hackett

James H. Turken

Neil Paresh Thakor

Robert A. Olson

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Leah Elizabeth Solomon

Gregory S. Korman

Meegan Isabelle Maczek

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Fred W. Trester

Mark R. Wilson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: AOB+30in re omission letter dated 7.6.2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: SCLA Civil Appeals in re omission letter dated 7.6.2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Suspend briefing.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: JTL Investor, LLC Attorney: David Eric Hackett Attorney: James H. Turken Attorney: Neil Paresh Thakor Attorney: Robert A. Olson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketBrief: Suspend briefing.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: JTL Investor, LLCAttorney: David Eric Hackett Attorney: James H. Turken Attorney: Neil Paresh Thakor Attorney: Robert A. Olson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: counsel for appellant informs SCLA on June 29, 2023 that items from the record are missing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated April 4, 2023: (R) **Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rules 8.130 and 8.147(b)(1), Plaintiff JTL Investor, LLC hereby designates and incorporates by reference as the reporter's transcript in the appeal filed February 1, 2023, all of those reporter's transcripts previously designated in the appeal entitled JTL Investor LLC v. Herscu et al., 2d Civ. No. B325578.**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: JTL Investor, LLC Attorney: David Eric Hackett (R) Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: JTL Investor, LLCAttorney: David Eric Hackett Attorney: James H. Turken Attorney: Neil Paresh Thakor Attorney: Robert A. Olson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: JTL Investor, LLCAttorney: David Eric Hackett; Notes: (R) Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant ( Feb 1, 2023 by JTL Investor, LLC (R). ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 14, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #404087 for $775 from lasc.(Appeal 02/01/2023)(R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on Feb 1, 2023 by JTL Investor, LLC (R).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV13312; Trial Court Judge: Fruin, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less