This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/31/2023 at 03:06:35 (UTC).

JTL Investor, LLC v. Herscu

Case Summary

On 03/15/2023 JTL Investor, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Herscu. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fruin, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7341

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fruin, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

JTL Investor, LLC

Robert Herscu

Peter Lowy

Appellants and Defendants

Robert Herscu

Peter Lowy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

James H. Turken

Neil Paresh Thakor

Robert A. Olson

David Eric Hackett

Meegan Isabelle Maczek

Gregory S. Korman

Leah Elizabeth Solomon

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Meegan Isabelle Maczek

Gregory S. Korman

Leah Elizabeth Solomon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry follow-up due.; Notes: Payment of reporter's transcript fees/deposit with LA Superior Court.(Cross-appeal April 10, 2023)(X1) (Cross-appeal April 10, 2023)(X2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Turndown filed Aug 1, 2023 - no reporter's transcripts available for Sep 7, 2022, Sep 9, 2022; and Dec 16, 2022(U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered cross-appellants' motion to reinstate cross-appeals filed on July 21, 2023. Good cause appearing, the motion is granted. The orders of dismissal filed July 6, 2023 are vacated, the cross-appeal filed April 10, 2023 (X1) and the cross-appeal filed April 10, 2023 (X2) 2023, are reinstated. Cross-appellants are granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by his/her failure to perform acts required by the rules of court for procuring the record on appeal. Cross-appellants must pay their respective reporter's transcript fees and deposit pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.130(b) within 15 days from the date of this order. The reporter's transcript fees must be paid at the Los Angeles Superior Court at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111-A, Los Angeles, California. Cross-appellants shall take immediate action to cure the default and, under no circumstances, shall cross-appellants take more than 15 days to do so. If cross-appellants fails to cure the default in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the cross-appeals will be dismissed without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Cross-appellants' motion to reinstate cross-appeals (Cross-appeal April 10, 2023)(X1) (Cross-appeal April 10, 2023)(X2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Filed by cross-appellants.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated (Cross-appeal April 10, 2023)(X2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated (Cross-appeal April 10, 2023)(X1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed April 10, 2023 (X2), is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed April 10, 2023 (X1), is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of cross-appeal filed on Apr. 10, 2023 by Robert Herscu. (X2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #405211 for $775. (Cross-appeal April 10, 2023)(X1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of cross-appeal filed on April 10, 2023 by Peter Lowy. (X1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated March 27, 2023: Appellant has not been granted a waiver of the fees for preparing a clerk's transcript. Respondents elect under rule 8.124(a) of the California Rules of Court to use an appendix in lieu of a clerk's transcript in all appeals filed by Appellant in this case, including the appeal filed March 15, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: JTL Investor, LLC Attorney: David Eric Hackett

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (March 15, 2023 by JTL Investor, LLC. (U1) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: JTL Investor, LLCAttorney: David Eric Hackett

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #620859 for $775.(U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on March 15, 2023 by JTL Investor, LLC. (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV13312; Trial Court Judge: Fruin, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less