This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2023 at 01:37:39 (UTC).

Jose Pena v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Jose Pena filed an Other lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0239

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Jose Pena

Appellant and Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y. Jacobson

Attorney at Quill & Arrow, LLP

10900 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Aaron Cohen

Attorney at Quill & Arrow, LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Patrick Sweeney

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Jane Minkyung Chung

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Amir M. Nassihi

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Andrew Lu-Young Chang

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nalani L. Crisologo

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Appellant's counsel RE: overdue SCIF. Attached another copy of notice and accompanying SCIF for completion and return by end of business today.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Cashier's check for $775.00; must be made payable to BANK OF AMERICA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Dec 7, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Nov 18, 2022; Nissan North America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVSB2124206; Trial Court Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUNG JANE MINKYUNG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NASSIHI AMIR M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRISOLOGO, NALANI L.