This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/21/2023 at 14:07:53 (UTC).

Jones et al. v. Meister et al.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 Jones filed an Other lawsuit against Meister. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4769

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Barmann, Bernard

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Richard Jones

Fast Response Security, Inc.

California City Supply, LLC dba Greenstone Cannabis Retail Store

Defendants and Respondents

Joshua Meister

Michael Ellison

Michael Gatto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley W Jacks

Attorney at Parker Shaffie LLP

800 W 6Th St Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2708

David Bruce Parker

Attorney at Parker Shaffie LLP

800 W 6Th St Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Edward Davis Baker

Attorney at Parker Shaffie LLP

800 W 6Th St Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Richard Scott Davis

Attorney at Fickel & Davis

3254 4Th Ave

San Diego, CA 92103

Michael Anthony Gatto

Attorney at Actium LLP

5419 Hollywood Blvd Ste C-356

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Allan David Johnson

Attorney at Actium LLP

99 S Lake Ave Ste 501

Pasadena, CA 91101-4702

Daniel R. Velladao

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-8198

Lillian Claire Harwell

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

633 W 5Th St Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Marie Leggon Wrighten

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2074

Timothy Ray Windham

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel Laurence Reback

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed change of firm name.; Notes: Atty Parker obo applts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Appellant(s) having filed a stipulation, abandonment and/or request for dismissal of appeal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal in the above-entitled action is dismissed. Pursuant to rule 8.244(c)(2), California Rules of Court, it is further ordered that the remittitur issue forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Atty Jacks obo applts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Abandonment of Appeal rejected due to: Incorrect form. (APP-005) Note: If the record has already been filed in the Court of Appeal, you cannot use this form; you must file a request for dismissal in the Court of Appeal. You can use form APP-OO7 to file a request for dismissal in the Court of Appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 1st Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: 2 Vols. / 45 pages (Original attached to appellant's designation pursuant to rule 8.130(b)(3)(C))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty David obo applt Joshua Meister (2nd Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: 8/19/22; failure to post $100 filing fee per CRC 8.100(b)(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 8/19/22; 2nd appeal; atty Davis obo Applt Joshua Meister; 5/26/22 ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Parker obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Parker obo Applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 8/3/22; amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1035232 for $775.00 by Atty Parker obo applt Jones

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 8/2/22; Atty Parker obo Ptlf; 5/26/22 ruling on special motion to strike first amended complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-20-102634; Trial Court Judge: Barmann, Bernard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less