This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/19/2023 at 02:13:50 (UTC).

Jones et al. v. The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 Jones filed an Other lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is George, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1787

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

George, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Christopher W. Jones

Rose Jones

Respondent and Defendant

The Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Jorge Ledezma

Attorney at Ledezma Robles, Babaee LLP

1851 East First St., Suite 610

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Mark Harber

Attorney at McCune & Harber LLP

515 S Figueroa St Ste 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Babak Shirdel

Attorney at McCune & Harber, LLP

515 S Figueroa St Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3328

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 02/08/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 2 CT (pgs. 1 - 378)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Notice of inability to provide RT's There is no record of nay reporter present on 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 10/18/2022 - Proceeding with CT's and RT's

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellants' filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: AMENDED: Notification of filing NOA - correcting appellant's attorney suite number.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS - no judgment attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant Christopher W. Jones and Rose Jones

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01171595; Trial Court Judge: George, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIRDEL BABAK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARBER STEPHEN M. ESQ