This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/13/2022 at 23:06:07 (UTC).

Jones et al. v. Reekes

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Jones filed an Other lawsuit against Reekes. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2866

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lampe, David

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Richard Jones

Fast Response Security Inc.

Preferred Towing Service LLC

Respondent and Defendant

Connie Reekes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Davis Denlinger

Attorney at Parker Mills LLP

800 W 6Th St Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2708

David Bruce Parker

Attorney at Parker Mills LLP

800 W 6Th St Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Philip W. Ganong

Attorney at Ganong Law Office

930 Truxtun Avenue, Suite 102

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Notice of Reassignment to Judge for all purposes filed 12/15/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Atty Parker obo Applts; Atty Wang is no longer with the firm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Fast Response Security Inc. Attorney: David Bruce Parker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Fast Response Security Inc.Attorney: David Bruce Parker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: atty Steven Wang has left the law firm; please replace with atty David Parker and Justin Denlinger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Connie Reekes Attorney: Philip W. Ganong

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: responsive fee submitted by atty Ganong

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: rbf received 11/9/21 rejected(Missing bookmarks (Table of Contents and Proof of Service) and CIP not included)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Connie ReekesAttorney: Philip W. Ganong

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: The motion to consolidate filed in F082499 was denied; pursuant to order filed on 6/17/21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Atty Wang and Atty Ganong filed joint motion to consolidate appeal numbers F082499 and F082866 in case number F082499.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the Court has determined that the entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Suspension of record preparation pursuant to local rule 2 is lifted and California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124 and 8.216, are reinstated as of the date of this letter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Wang obo Applt Jones et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Wang obo Applts Jones et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Check #8882 via mail. Receipt sent via email to counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Ganong obo Respondent Reekes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Wang obo Applts Richard "Rick" Jones, Preferred Towing Service LLC and Fast Response Security Inc. appeal from the 4/27/21 Revised 4/16/21 Order granting Motion for Award of Attorney Fees.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-20-102526; Trial Court Judge: Lampe, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENLINGER JUSTIN D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER, DAVID B