This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/29/2023 at 06:06:07 (UTC).

Johnson v. The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 Johnson filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7614

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christian L. Johnson

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Interested Party

Department of Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John A. Shepardson

Interested Party Attorneys

Nikolette Ysidra Clavel

Phillip Sheridan Coonley

William Christopher Sims

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Notes: The superior court having complied with this court's order of January 10, 2023, the petition for writ of mandate is dismissed as moot. The stay previously issued by this court on January 10, 2023, is vacated. Mauro, Acting P.J., Duarte, J., Krause, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Order filed in the trial court on 2/1/23 vacating the 12/12/22 order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: The court order dated 02/01/2023, from the Superior Court of San Joaquin County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: letter from petitioner to superior court requesting RPI's time to file opposition be shortened to 01/20/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice filed in the trial court on 1/10/23 of intent to proceed in manner set forth in Palma order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: See order filed on 1/10/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Palma sent. Response due:; Notes: By way of petition for writ of mandate, petitioner Christian L. Johnson challenges trial court Judge Barbara A. Kronlund's December 12, 2022, order striking petitioner's fourth statement of disqualification. No opposition was filed. As explained below, it appears the trial court erred. This court accordingly issues a stay of all proceedings, pending further order of this court, except as to proceedings described herein. This court is considering issuing a peremptory writ of mandate in the first instance, i.e., without first issuing an alternative writ. (Palma v. U.S. Industrial Fasteners, Inc. (1984) 36 Cal.3d 171.) The current petition will become moot if the court vacates its order of December 12, 2022, (striking petitioner's fourth statement of disqualification) and instead permits the question of disqualification to be otherwise resolved as described in Code of Civil Procedure section 170.3. In the event the trial court is considering proceeding in this manner, it must, however, afford the parties notice and an opportunity to be heard before vacating its earlier decision. (See Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri, Inc. v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233.) Respondent court is requested to inform this court of any relevant action in the case that it takes consistent with this notice and to provide a status update on or before January 23, 2023. If respondent court chooses to change its order in the manner described herein, this court will dismiss the instant petition as moot. Mauro, Acting P.J., Duarte, J., Krause, J. (See full order for details.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: petition. 2 vols. (318 pp.).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with request for immediate stay. CIEP included; no interested parties listed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Joaquin County Superior Court; County: San Joaquin; Trial Court Case Number: STKCVUCR20190000281; Trial Court Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less