This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/28/2021 at 22:17:11 (UTC).

Johnson v. The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Johnson filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4966

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christian L. Johnson

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Interested Party

California Department of Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John A. Shepardson

Attorney at Law Offices of John A. Shepardson

125 E. Sunnyoaks Avenue, Suite 104

Campbell, CA 95008

Interested Party Attorneys

William Christopher Sims

Attorney at California Department of Transportation

1120 N Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Phillip Sheridan Coonley

Attorney at California Department of Transportation

1120 N Streey

Sacramento, CA 95814

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The temporary stay issued by this court on October 18, 2021 is hereby dissolved. Cantil-Sakauye, C.J. (Received 11/15/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Petitioner's reply to answer to petition for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: To permit consideration of the petition for review filed herein, the trial court's September 20, 2021 order overruling plaintiff's objections based upon attorney-client privilege is hereby stayed pending further order of this court. Defendant California Department of Transportation is directed to file an answer to the petition for review. The answer must be served upon petitioner and filed in this court on or before 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 28, 2021. The answer should address all issues raised in the petition for review. Petitioner must file and serve a reply to the answer on or before 3:00 p.m. on Tuesday, November 2, 2021. The court does not contemplate granting any requests for extension of time. Cantil-Sakauye, C.J. (Received 10/20/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Petitioner's (S271340).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or certiorari with request for stay is denied. Raye, P.J., Mauro, J., Duarte, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or certiorari with request for stay is denied. Raye, P.J., Mauro, J., Duarte, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Petitioner clarifying the urgency of the petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: mandate, prohibition, or certiorari. 3 vols. (1,841 pgs.) Filed with deficiencies.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate, prohibition, or certiorari with request for stay. Filed with deficiencies.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Joaquin County is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant