This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/25/2022 at 21:22:02 (UTC).

JOHNSON v. S.C. (CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION)

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 JOHNSON filed an Other lawsuit against C CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1340

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christian L. Johnson

Respondent

Superior Court of San Joaquin County

180 East Weber Avenue

Stockton, CA 95202

Interested Party

California Department of Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John A. Shepardson

Attorney at Law Offices of John A. Shepardson

125 East Sunnyoaks Avenue, Suite 104

Campbell, CA 95008

Interested Party Attorneys

William Christopher Sims

Attorney at California Department of Transportation

1120 North Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Judith A. Carlson

Attorney at California Department of Transportation

Legal Division - Ms 57 1120 N Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Phillip Sheridan Coonley

Attorney at California Department of Transportation

1120 North Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Stay Dissolved; Petition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay dissolved; petition denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The temporary stay issued by this court on October 18, 2021 is hereby dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Christian L. Johnson Attorney: John A. Shepardson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: California Department of Transportation Attorney: Judith A. Carlson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed; Notes: To permit consideration of the petition for review filed herein, the trial court's September 20, 2021 order overruling plaintiff's objections based upon attorney-client privilege is hereby stayed pending further order of this court. Defendant California Department of Transportation is directed to file an answer to the petition for review. The answer must be served upon petitioner and filed in this court on or before 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 28, 2021. The answer should address all issues raised in the petition for review. Petitioner must file and serve a reply to the answer on or before 3:00 p.m. on Tuesday, November 2, 2021. The court does not contemplate granting any requests for extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Electronic record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Christian L. Johnson Attorney: John A. Shepardson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C094966; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: San Joaquin County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: STKCVUCR20190000281

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Joaquin County is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Sheridan Coonley