This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/13/2022 at 15:08:28 (UTC).

Johnson et al. v. The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Johnson filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6210

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christian Johnson et al.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Interested Party

Department of Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John A. Shepardson

Attorney at Law Offices of John A. Shepardson

125 E. Sunnyoaks Avenue, Suite 104

Campbell, CA 95008

Interested Party Attorneys

William Christopher Sims

Attorney at California Department of Transportation

1120 N Street, Ms 57

Sacramento, CA 95814

Phillip Sheridan Coonley

Attorney at California Department of Transportation

1120 N Street, Ms 57

Sacramento, CA 95814

Nikolette Ysidra Clavel

Attorney at CA Dept of Transportation

1120 N Street, Ms 57

Sacramento, CA 95814

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J. (Received 05/18/22.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed in Supreme Court.; Notes: By Petitioner (S274590).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Petitioners'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or certiorari with request for stay is denied as untimely. Raye, P.J., Robie, J., Duarte, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition. 5 Vols. (5145 pp.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, prohibition, or certiorari w/CIEP. No interested parties listed. Stay requested. Urgency date May 17, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Joaquin County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Sheridan Coonley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Christopher Sims