This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/18/2023 at 13:05:35 (UTC).

Johal v. City of Fresno

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Johal filed an Other lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3372

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Bahadar Johal

Defendants and Respondents

City of Fresno

Sethi Management Inc

Interested Party and Respondent

Sethi Management Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

John Michael Cardot

Attorney at Quall Cardot LLP

205 E River Park Cir Ste 110

Fresno, CA 93720

Matthew R. Dardenne

Attorney at Quail Cardot LLP

205 E River Park Circle, Suite 110

Fresno, CA 93720

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Michael Christopher Huston

Attorney at Aleshire & Wynder, LLP

18881 Von Karman Ave Ste 1700

Irvine, CA 92612

Anthony Robert Taylor

Attorney at Aleshire & Wynder LLP

18881 Von Karman Ave Ste 1700

Irvine, CA 92612

Todd W. Baxter

Attorney at McCormick Barstow LLP

7647 N. Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Jeffrey M. Reid

Attorney at McCormick, Barstow, Sheppard, etc.

7647 North Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Todd W. Baxter

Attorney at McCormick Barstow LLP

7647 N. Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Jeffrey M. Reid

Attorney at McCormick, Barstow, Sheppard, etc.

7647 North Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

F083372

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The judgment is affirmed. City and Developer shall recover costs on appeal; Hill, Detjen, Pe a; 22 pages; Publication Status: By the Court - Unpublished; Participants: Detjen, Jennifer R.S. (Concur) Pena, Jr., Rosendo (Concur) Hill, Brad R. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (By the Court - Unpublished) The judgment is affirmed. City and Developer shall recover costs on appeal; Hill, Detjen, Pe a; 22 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.; Notes: In response to questionnaires sent to the parties, the parties have either not returned their questionnaire?resulting in an implied agreement to waive oral argument?or indicated they are willing to waive oral argument. The court approves the waiver of oral argument in this case and the matter stands submitted as of the date of this order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Aplt Csl Cardot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Conditional waiver filed by:; Notes: Resp Csl Huston - PA/15 Mins - April 7, 2023 - April 17, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Conditional waiver filed by:; Notes: RPI Csl Reid - VC/15 Mins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: 10 day letter sent (B.T.C. case).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: B.T.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bahadar Johal Attorney: John Michael Cardot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Cardot obo Applt Johal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement submitted by Atty Cardot through TrueFiling; no copy of order/judgment being appealed from attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Huston obo Respondent City of Fresno

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Responsive Filing Fee obo Respondent City of Fresno

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Ck#063010 from Quall Cardot LLP obo Applt Johal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All counsel and superior court re: Mediation Screening Questionnaire due within 10 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Attys Cardot/Dardenne obo Applt Johal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Cardot obo Applt Bahadar Johal appeal from judgment of dismissal after an order sustaining a demurrer entered 8/25/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 21CECG00487

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less