This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/04/2022 at 14:13:27 (UTC).

J.H. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 J H filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chilton, Katherine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6209

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Chilton, Katherine

 

Party Details

Petitioners

J. H.

Tatanisha Bingham

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Los Angeles Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Timothy Daniel Wright

Attorney at Law Offices of Tim D Wright

1112 W Burbank Blvd Ste 302

Burbank, CA 91506-1455

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Katherine Chilton

Attorney at Dept. 26

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Arthur C. Preciado

Attorney at Gutierrez, Preciado & House LLP

3020 East Colorado Blvd.

Pasadena, CA 91107

Vladyslava Victoria Turner

Attorney at Gutierrez, Preciado & House, LLP

3020 E Colorado Blvd

Pasadena, CA 91107-3840

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on November 9, 2021. We also read and considered the opposition filed on November 15, 2021. The petition is untimely. (See Code Civ. Proc., 403.080.) Accordingly, the petition is denied. Grimes, Acting P.J. / Stratton, J. / Harutunian, J.* ______________ *Judge of the San Diego Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: REAL PARTY'S PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Vol 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate (Stay Requested)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vladyslava Victoria Turner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRECIADO ARTHUR C.