This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/03/2022 at 02:00:48 (UTC).

JEUNESSE v. S.C. (XIONG)

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 JEUNESSE filed an Other lawsuit against C XIONG. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4019

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jeunesse, LLC

Kim Hui

Respondent

Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. James J. Di Cesare 700 Civic Center Drive West, Dept. C16

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Helen Xiong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alan J. Lazarus

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ryan Matthew Salzman

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1504

Interested Party Attorney

Blake J. Lindemann

433 North Camden Drive, 4Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Jeunesse, LLC Attorney: Alan J. Lazarus Petitioner: Kim Hui Attorney: Alan J. Lazarus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Helen Xiong Attorney: Blake J. Lindemann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Jeunesse, LLC Attorney: Alan J. Lazarus Petitioner: Kim Hui Attorney: Alan J. Lazarus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G061183; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01095448

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jeunesse, Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDEMANN BLAKE J.