This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/10/2022 at 22:02:47 (UTC).

Jeunesse, LLC et al. v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Jeunesse, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Di Cesare, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1183

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Di Cesare, James

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jeunesse, LLC

Kim Hui

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. James J. Di Cesare 700 Civic Center Dr West Dept C16

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Helen Xiong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alan J. Lazarus

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ryan Matthew Salzman

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park E Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1504

Interested Party Attorney

Blake J. Lindemann

433 N Camden Dr 4Th Fl

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: Filed on: 06-01-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: filed by petitioner: Supreme Court case number S274019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: all documents scanned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is DENIED. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Moore, J., and Marks, J.** **Judge of the Orange County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply in support of petition for writ of mandate by petitioners.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Supplemental Exhibits to petition for writ of mandate Vol. 5 pages 956-998

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Helen Xiong Attorney: Blake J. Lindemann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Helen XiongAttorney: Blake J. Lindemann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On March 9, 2022, petitioners filed a petition for writ of mandate. Real party in interest may file preliminary opposition or other informal response by March 28, 2022. No fee is required for this response requested by this court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 4 volumes exhibits (955 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of Ryan M. Salzman in support of petition for writ of mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Writ of Mandate Petitioners Jeunesse, LLC et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jeunesse, Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDEMANN BLAKE J.