This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/18/2022 at 18:01:39 (UTC).

JENSEN v. JENSEN

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 JENSEN filed an Other lawsuit against JENSEN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4297

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Kristen Kerr Jensen

Defendant and Appellant

Steven E. Jensen

Not Yet Classified

Family Violence Appellate Project

Alliance for HOPE International

Calegislation

California Protective Parents Association

Center for Community Solutions

Central California Legal Services, Inc.

Coalition for Family Harmony

Community Legal Aid SoCal

Desert Sanctuary, Inc.

Family Violence Law Center

Harriett Buhai Center for Family Law

LACBA Counsel for Justice Domestic Violence Project

Los Angeles Center for Law and Justice

Law Foundation of Silicon Valley

Stopping Domestic Violence

Julie Saffren

Jane Stoever

Kelly Weisberg

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Tomoko Kuwahara

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

515 S Flower Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Arati Vasan

Attorney at Family Violence Appellate Project

449 15Th Street Ste 104

Oakland, CA 94612-2827

Andrew John Holmer

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

515 S Flower Street, Floor 40

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Judith Lewis

Attorney at Family Violence Appellate Project

449 Fifteenth St Ste 104

Oakland, CA 94612

Erin Canfield Smith

Attorney at Family Violence Appellate Project

449 15Th Street, Suite 104

Oakland, CA 94612-3436

Jennafer Dorfman Wagner

Attorney at Family Violence Appellate Project

449 15Th Street, Suite 104

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Joseph S. Klapach

Attorney at Klapach & Klapach, P.C.

15303 Venturea Boulevard - #1510

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Jacob Yale Glucksman

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jacob Glucksman

15915 Ventura Boulevard Suite 203

Encino, CA 91436

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Shohrah Shuray Ghorishi

Attorney at Family Violence Appellate Project

1814 Franklin Street, Suite 805

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Family Violence Appellate Project Attorney: Shohrah Shuray Ghorishi Pub/Depublication Requestor: Alliance for HOPE International Pub/Depublication Requestor: Calegislation Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Protective Parents Association Pub/Depublication Requestor: Center for Community Solutions Pub/Depublication Requestor: Central California Legal Services, Inc. Pub/Depublication Requestor: Coalition for Family Harmony Pub/Depublication Requestor: Community Legal Aid SoCal Pub/Depublication Requestor: Desert Sanctuary, Inc. Pub/Depublication Requestor: Family Violence Law Center Pub/Depublication Requestor: Harriett Buhai Center for Family Law Pub/Depublication Requestor: LACBA Counsel for Justice Domestic Violence Project Pub/Depublication Requestor: Los Angeles Center for Law and Justice Pub/Depublication Requestor: Law Foundation of Silicon Valley Pub/Depublication Requestor: Stopping Domestic Violence Pub/Depublication Requestor: Julie Saffren Pub/Depublication Requestor: Jane Stoever Pub/Depublication Requestor: Kelly Weisberg **Court of Appeal recommends the opinion not be published on the ground it does not meet the standards of publication.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B307354; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BD553016

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central California Legal Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Center for Community Solutions is a litigant