This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/17/2023 at 01:28:57 (UTC).

Jensen v. Charon Solutions, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Jensen filed an Other lawsuit against Charon Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Draper, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0268

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Draper, Robert

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Peaches Nong Jensen

Appellants and Defendants

Charon Solutions, Inc.

Perry Leonard Segal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Yvonne M. Renfrew

Attorney at Law Offices of Yvonne M. Renfrew

P.O. Box 31077

Los Angeles, CA 90031

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Henry J. Josefsberg

10936 Portal Dr

Los Alamitos, CA 90720-2519

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: as to appeal filed July 22, 2022 by Jensen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has reviewed respondent's request to appear for the January 2023 oral argument calendar. Respondent's request was received on December 24, 2022, and filed on December 27, 2022. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(2), respondent's request to appear for oral argument is hereby denied. IT IS ORDERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: request to argue filed by Attorney Yvonne M. Renfrew - counsel requests 30 minutes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant Charon Solutions' request for permission to continue oral argument filed December 20, 2022. Appellant's request is hereby denied. Appellant may appear telephonically and view the live feed of the oral argument available on the Second District Court of Appeal's calendar page on the court's website https://www.courts.ca.gov/11603.htm. Henry J. Josefsberg is hereby directed to be available to participate by telephone at 11:00 a.m. Thursday, January 19, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Henry J. Josefsberg, counsel for appellant Charon- argue, 7 minutes;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral arg - to court.; Notes: Henry J. Josefsberg, counsel for appellant request for permission to continue oral argument

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: Thursday, January 19, 2023, at 9:00am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant Peaches Nong Jensen's motion for orders (i) vacating dismissal of and reinstating cross-appeal, (2) staying issuance of remittitur, and (iii) permitting late filing ofcombined respondent's and cross-appellant's opening brief, filed November 28, 2022, is hereby denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: respondent/cross-appellant Peaches Jensen's motion to reinstate appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance of default dated 11/10/22; failure to designate record, pay fees/deposits, $100 fee. NOA 7/22/22 (X)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: an AOB, appendix and lodging of RTs was due by 6/13/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on May 21, 2022 rejected as a duplicate. A civil case information statement was already filed on May 13, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Charon Solutions, Inc. Attorney: Henry J. Josefsberg Defendant and Appellant: Perry Leonard Segal Attorney: Henry J. Josefsberg (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix / opening brief and to be lodged reporters transcript are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice dated April 4, 2022: RT to be lodged (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Charon Solutions, Inc.Attorney: Henry J. Josefsberg Defendant and Appellant: Perry Leonard SegalAttorney: Henry J. Josefsberg; Notes: (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: ("U1")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 3/24/2022 by Charon Solutions, Inc. and Perry Leonard Segal ("U1")*proceed by Appendix and Reporters' Transcripts*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC469884; Trial Court Judge: Draper, Robert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charon Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEFSBERG HENRY J. ESQ.