This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/24/2022 at 02:50:33 (UTC).

Jensen v. Charon Solutions, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Jensen filed an Other lawsuit against Charon Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Draper, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2934

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Draper, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peaches Nong Jensen

Appellant

PeachTree Financial Corp.

Defendants and Respondents

Charon Solutions, Inc.

Perry Leonard Segal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yvonne M. Renfrew

Attorney at Law Offices of

P.O. Box 31077

Los Angeles, CA 90031

Appellant Attorney

Brooke Leone Bove

Attorney at Bove Law Group

3843 S. Bristol St. #234

Santa Ana, CA 92704-7426

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Henry J. Josefsberg

4050 Katella Avenue Suite 205

Los Alamitos, CA 90720

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's request, the appeal filed May 24, 2021 is dismissed. The clerk shall issue the remittitur forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: appellant's request for dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: an AOB/appendix was due by 10/12/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: PeachTree Financial Corp. Attorney: Brooke Leone Bove ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: PeachTree Financial Corp.Attorney: Brooke Leone Bove; Notes: ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Bove, Brooke.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 3, 2021 - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: May 24, 2021: Peachtree Financial Corp. - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC469884; Trial Court Judge: Draper, Robert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charon Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOVE BROOKE LEONE