This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/29/2021 at 01:41:38 (UTC).

J.E. v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 J E filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucero, Katherine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8248

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucero, Katherine

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Joel Eslava

J. E.

Respondents and Interested Parties

The People

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jung Le

120 W Mission St

San Jose, CA 95110

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Kevin Daniel Smith

Attorney at Santa Clara County

70 W Hedding St West Wing Ofc District Attorney

San Jose, CA 95110

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Kaci Rebecca Lopez

Attorney at Office of District Attorney

70 West Hedding Street, West Wing

San Jose, CA 95110

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • HearingDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, habeas corpus, or other appropriate relief is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, habeas corpus, or other appropriate relief is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service for reply to opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply to preliminary opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Denied - extension of time.; Notes: The People's request for an extension of time to file preliminary opposition to the petition for writ of mandate is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The court requests that real party in interest serve and file on or before September 16, 2020 points and authorities in preliminary opposition to the petition. Petitioner may serve and file a reply within five days after the preliminary opposition is filed in this court. No extensions of time are contemplated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No opposition filed (Due 07/16/20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Corrected exhibits vol. 2 Pgs. 301-419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Corrected exhibits vol. 1 Pgs. 1-300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Resubmitted exhibits are incorrectly paginated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 2 of 2 * * * Missing Coversheet * * *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 1 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant