This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/27/2021 at 01:40:08 (UTC).

Jauregui v. LPF Re Manager, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Jauregui filed an Other lawsuit against LPF Re Manager, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Palazuelos, Yvette. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1570

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Palazuelos, Yvette

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Martin Jauregui

Appellant

Prospective Intervenors

Respondents and Defendants

LPF Re Manager, LLC

Martin Jauregui

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Alvin Brock Lindsay

Attorney at David Yeremian & Associates, Inc.

535 N Brand Blvd Suite 705

Glendale, CA 91203

Walter Lewis Haines

Attorney at United Employees Law Group

5500 Bolsa Ave, Ste 201

Huntington Beach, CA 92649-1102

Appellant Attorneys

Natalia Ramirez Lee

Attorney at Mallison & Martinez

1939 Harrison St Ste 730

Oakland, CA 94612

Heather M Hamilton

Attorney at Mallison & Martinez

1939 Harrison Street, Suite 730

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Rose Leitzinger

Attorney at Fenton & Keller

Po Box 791

Monterey, CA 93942

Alvin Brock Lindsay

Attorney at David Yeremian & Associates, Inc.

535 N Brand Blvd Suite 705

Glendale, CA 91203

Walter Lewis Haines

Attorney at United Employees Law Group

5500 Bolsa Ave, Ste 201

Huntington Beach, CA 92649-1102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (411 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Heather M. Hamilton substituting in for Natalia Ramirez Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellants' motion to stay Jauregui v. LPF RE Manager, LLC, Case No. 19STCV36107, filed May 11, 2021, is DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to appellant's motion to stay superior court case no. 19STCV36107

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellants' Motion to Stay...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated April 7, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Prospective Intervenors Attorney: Natalia Ramirez Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 11/24/2021; Party Attorney: Appellant: Prospective IntervenorsAttorney: Heather M Hamilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Prospective IntervenorsAttorney: Natalia Ramirez Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on April 19, 2020 was rejected for failure to provide appealable order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1)).)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check #4036 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Mar 26, 2021 by Prospective Intervenors'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV36107; Trial Court Judge: Palazuelos, Yvette

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAINES WALTER LEWIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDSAY ALVIN B.