This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/20/2022 at 21:45:31 (UTC).

JASSIM v. BRENTWOOD CEDAR TREE HOA

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 JASSIM filed an Other lawsuit against BRENTWOOD CEDAR TREE HOA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2374

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Esmaiel Jassim

Defendants and Respondents

Brentwood Cedar Tree HOA

City of Los Angeles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Haytham Faraj

Attorney at The Law Offices of Haytham Faraj

8605 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 44953

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Tracy Diana Forbath

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-8198

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Charles Lane Harris

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Gregory Dilts

Attorney at Hartsuyker Stratman & Williams-Abrego

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

Paul L. Winnemore

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street City Hall East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Blithe S. Bock

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street 7Th Floor, Che

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hall R. Marston

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90012-5556

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: City of Los Angeles Attorney: Hall R. Marston **Request for publication denied, opinion does not meet the standards for publication pursuant to CRC, rule 8.1105(c).**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Formerly consolidated with B305930 by Court of Appeal order filed July 6, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B305930 B305752 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC711946

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINNEMORE PAUL L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracy Diana Forbath