This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/19/2023 at 15:17:31 (UTC).

James Suess v. CalPers et al.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 James Suess filed an Other lawsuit against CalPers. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9386

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

James Suess

Respondents and Defendants

CalPers

City of Pomona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Linda Louise Scott

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Austa Wakily

Jessica Marie Serrato

Steven H Ngo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Transferred to Court of Appeal; Disposition Type: Final Division 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Intra District Transfer to:; Notes: Division 3; Rec'd order dtd Jun 1, 2023; CRC 10.1000(a)(1)(D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: James Suess Attorney: Linda Louise Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: James SuessAttorney: Linda Louise Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: CalPers Attorney: Austa Wakily

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: CalPersAttorney: Austa Wakily

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: CalPers Attorney: Austa Wakily

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: CalPersAttorney: Austa Wakily

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (336 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Jul 19, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Corrected dtd Jul 18, 2022; James Suess

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jul 8, 2022; James Suess

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVSB2106412; Trial Court Judge: Cohn, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less