This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/17/2021 at 06:51:24 (UTC).

James D. Miller, Jr., Insurance Agency et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 James D Miller, Jr , Insurance Agency filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandvig, Melvin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7064

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sandvig, Melvin

 

Party Details

Petitioners

James D. Miller

James D. Miller, Jr., Insurance Agency

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Interested Party

Cypress Ridge, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Caroline E. Chan

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Connie Marie Anderson Fickel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 West 5 Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Thomas Russell, III

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2074

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Roslynn M. Wilfert

Attorney at Wilfert Law, PC

5700 Ralston St Ste 309

Ventura, CA 93003-7846

Jarrod Matthew Wilfert

Attorney at WilfertLaw, P.C.

5700 Ralston St Ste 309

Ventura, CA 93003

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed August 17, 2020; and the motion to vacate docket entry and for deeming petition and exhibits filed August 14, 2020, have been read and considered. The motion is granted. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed August 17, 2020; and the motion to vacate docket entry and for deeming petition and exhibits filed August 14, 2020, have been read and considered. The motion is granted. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Petitioners' Motion to Vacate Docket Entry and for an Order Deeming Petition and Exhibits were filed on August 14, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandate (Volumes 1-2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilfert, Roslynn M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILFERT JARROD M.