This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2023 at 00:20:20 (UTC).

Jacobs v. City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 02/03/2023 Jacobs filed an Other lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karnow, Curtis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7220

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karnow, Curtis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Larry Jacobs

Defendant and Appellant

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Jane E. Brunner

Daniel Mark Siegel

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Amy Pizzo Frenzen

Jonathan C. Rolnick

David Sen-Fu Chiu

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 06/26/2023 By 40 Day(s) + 40 days on AOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Transmittal sheet from SF Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-11(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: City and County of San Francisco Attorney: Amy Pizzo Frenzen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 06/26/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: City and County of San FranciscoAttorney: Amy Pizzo Frenzen Attorney: David Sen-Fu Chiu

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: City and County of San FranciscoAttorney: Amy Pizzo Frenzen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 02/03/2023 by Counsel for Defendant City and County of San Francisco appealing judgment from 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20586245; Trial Court Judge: Karnow, Curtis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less