This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/13/2021 at 13:13:51 (UTC).

J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. v. Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Alameda. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson, Earl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1046

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    First Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Nelson, Earl

 

Party Details

Petitioner

J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Interested Parties

Cornelius Williams

Uniacke Construction, Inc.

Calaveras Asbestos Ltd.

A.H. Voss Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Carrie Lin

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg (MG+M)

201 Spear Street Floor 18

San Francisco, CA 94105

Interested Party Attorneys

William F. Ruiz

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd, LLC

1900 Powell Street, Suite 200

Emeryville, CA 94608

David L. Amell

Attorney at Maune, Raichle, Hartley, French & Mudd, LLC

1900 Powell Street, Suite 200

Emeryville, CA 94608

Hillary H Huth

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery St Fl 9

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

Ingrid K. Campagne

Attorney at Walsworth, Franklin, Bevins & McCall

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew Livingston Sharp

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield

2185 N California Blvd, Ste 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Gary D. Sharp

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield

2185 North California Blvd. - Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Robert G. Engel

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

525 Market St 17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

Lisa Silva Passalacqua

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Shipped to state retention center, box # / list #:; Notes: *** Entire file electronic***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Rejected Petition for Writ of Mandate and Exhibits submitted by Carrie Lin, Esq. on January 14, 2021 for the following reason: Case number A161046 is closed. The denial order issued on October 9, 2020, and the order was final upon filing. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.490(1).) If you wish to submit the a new writ petition, you will need to initiate a new case in TrueFiling, and a new appellate case number will be assigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The request for immediate stay and petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, and/or other appropriate relief are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The request for immediate stay and petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, and/or other appropriate relief are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2; Exhibits 16 - 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1; Exhibits 1 - 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition and/or Other Appropriate Relief Immediate Stay Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19032329; Trial Court Judge: Nelson, Earl

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIACKE CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where A.H. VOSS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Alameda is a litigant

Latest cases where J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC. is a litigant