This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/24/2021 at 22:19:29 (UTC).

Izadpanahi v. Hittites, Corp.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Izadpanahi filed an Other lawsuit against Hittites, Corp. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karlan, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5306

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karlan, Craig

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Kourosh Izadpanahi

West Hills, CA 91307

Respondents and Defendants

Hittites, Corp.

Maria Alma Yolanda Ibarra Dabdoub Trus

Jae H. Kim

Tofal, LLC.

Manoosh Amirchian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Eli Allen Gordon

Attorney at Kimball Tirey & St. John, LLP

915 Wilshire Blvd. Ste 1650

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Jorgen Kjar

Attorney at Kjar, McKenna and Stockalper LLP,

841 Apollo St. Ste 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Lee David Lubin

Attorney at Law Offices of Lee David Lubin

16133 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1175

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kourosh Izadpanahi Pro Per (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kourosh IzadpanahiPro Per; Notes: (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Partial (Sept. 20, 2021: Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: (R)GRANTED fee wavier dated Sept 1, 2021 (re: B314257)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sept. 22, 2021: Kourosh Izadpanahi - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: (Sept. 20, 2021: Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sept. 20, 2021: Kourosh Izadpanahi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19SMCV01795; Trial Court Judge: Karlan, Craig

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOFAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KJAR JAMES JORGEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON ELI A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBIN LEE DAVID