This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/04/2022 at 01:16:02 (UTC).

Iwamoto et al. v. Lai et al.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Iwamoto filed an Other lawsuit against Lai. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zeltzer, Nancy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0604

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Zeltzer, Nancy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Wayne Iwamoto

Susan James-Iwamoto

Defendants and Appellants

Kowen Lai

Tzuchuan Lung

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Damon D. Mircheff

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Gerard M. Mooney

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker LLP

18575 Jamboree Rd 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Larry Rothman

Attorney at Larry Rothman & Associates

5753 East Santa Ana Canyon Road Suite G558

Anaheim, CA 92807-1102

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Roger E. Naghash

19800 Macarthur Blvd Ste 1100

Irvine, CA 92612

Kathleen Mary Kushi Carter

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP, 650 Town Center Drive

650 Town Center Drive Suite 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Idin Kashefipour

Attorney at Messner Reeves, LLP

610 Newport Center Dr Ste 420

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6450

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 07/01/2022 By 16 Day(s) To 07/01/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent's associate Damon Mircheff and Gerard Mooney of the law firm of Rutan & Tucker, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/15/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: $390 paid responsive filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 05/16/2022 By 35 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: AOB. Rejected. AOB filed 3-11-22. This document is duplicative.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kowen Lai Attorney: Idin Kashefipour Defendant and Appellant: Tzuchuan Lung Attorney: Idin Kashefipour Two extensions granted for a total of 91 days: 11/17/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 01/21/2022 By 59 Day(s) 01/21/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/22/2022 By 32 Day(s) ** LAST EXTENSION ** CIP is not bookmarked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief was rejected. Missing bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/01/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Wayne IwamotoAttorney: Gerard M. Mooney Attorney: Larry Rothman

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing fee deposited with Superior Court. Payment forthcoming.Per Accounting Dept. The Appellate Division never submitted the request to accounting Dept. It will take two to three weeks to process.Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: proceeding with settled statement2-CT (1-439 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 8/30/2021. Proceeds by rule 8.122 CT (Settled statement under rule 8.137, oral proceedings in the superior court were not reported by a court reporter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: APLT attorney Roger Naghash SUBS OUT and Attorney Kathleen Carter SUBS IN for APLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Substitution of attorney has been returned. Need to sign proof of service. It also says "see attached proof of service" and there isn't any document attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: Kowen Lai et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2021-01193481; Trial Court Judge: Zeltzer, Nancy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASHEFIPOUR IDIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGHASH ROGER E. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUSHI CARTER, KATHLEEN MARY