This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/03/2023 at 23:44:02 (UTC).

Intrivo Diagnostics, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 Intrivo Diagnostics, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mooney, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3949

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mooney, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Intrivo Diagnostics, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Mark V. Mooney

Interested Parties

Access Bio, Inc.

Areum Bio LLC

IVY Pharma, Inc.

Vivera Pharmeceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

John Charles Hueston

Robert Nathan Klieger

Craig Alexander Fligor

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Presiding Judge

Interested Party Attorneys

Christopher Tayback

Valerie Suzanne Roddy

Michael Louis Fazio

David Morad Elihu

Jaime W. Marquart

Ryan Geoffrey Baker

Jose R. Nuno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for a writ of mandate filed October 18, 2022, as well as the preliminary opposition filed October 26, 2022. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Response fee paid via credit card for Access Bio, Inc. et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: RPI Access Bio Inc. et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: preliminary opposition filed by Access Bio, Inc. et al. (RPI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Frederick Bennett old email 1: fbennett@lacourt.org new email 1: courtcounselwrits@lacourt.org old email 2: PNguyen1@lacourt.org; LGershon@LACourt.org new email 2: {blank}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: amended proof of service of writ petition on trial court judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Three (3) volumes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or other appropriate relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22STCV01975; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22STCV09935; Trial Court Judge: Mooney, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less